The DAV Class 6 Maths Book Solutions Pdf and **DAV Class 6 Maths Chapter 1 Worksheet 5 **Solutions of Natural Numbers and Whole Numbers offer comprehensive answers to textbook questions.

## DAV Class 6 Maths Ch 1 WS 5 Solutions

Question 1.

Fill in the following blanks by using different properties of multiplication.

(a) 52 × (63 + 37) = (52 × _____) + (_____ × 37)

Solution:

63, 52

(b) 297 × (_____ + 43) = (297 × 88) + (297 × _____)

Solution:

88, 43

(c) _____ × (84 + 16) = 36 × 84 + 36 × _____

Solution:

36, 16

(d) 218 × 94 = (218 × _____) – (218 × 6)

Solution:

100

(e) 778 × 994 = (778 × 1000) – (778 × _____) – 778

Solution:

5

Question 2.

Re-arrange the numbers and then multiply them.

(a) 125 × 488 × 8

Solution:

125 × 488 × 8 = (125 × 8) × 488

= 100 × 488

= 48800

(b) 625 × 25 × 20 × 4

Solution:

625 × 25 × 20 × 4 = 625 × 20 × (25 × 4)

= 625 × (20 × 100)

= 625 × 2000

= 1250000

(c) 16 × 125 × 8 × 625

Solution:

16 × 125 × 8 × 625 = (16 × 125) × (8 × 625)

= 2000 × 5000

= 1,00,00,000

(d) 20 × 1975 × 5

Solution:

20 × 1975 × 5 = 1975 × (20 × 5)

= 1975 × 100

= 197500

(e) 8 × 25 × 125 × 40

Solution:

8 × 25 × 125 × 40 = (8 × 25) × (125 × 40)

= 200 × 5000

= 10,00,000

(f) 200 × 625 × 16 × 50

Solution:

200 × 625 × 16 × 50 = 625 × 16 × (200 × 50)

= (625 × 16) × 10000

= 10000 × 10000

= 10,00,00,000

Question 3.

Find the product by using distributive property.

(a) 241 × 107

Solution:

241 × 107 = 241 × (100 + 7)

= 241 × 100 + 7 × 241

= 24100 + 1687

= 25787

(b) 685 × 94

Solution:

685 × 94 = 685 × (100 – 6)

= 685 × 100 – 685 × 6

= 68500 – 4110

= 64390

(c) 439 × 995

Solution:

439 × 995 = 439 × (1000 – 5)

= 439 × 1000 – 5 × 439

= 439000 – 2195

= 436905

(d) 1009 × 1392

Solution:

1009 × 1392 = (1000 + 9) × 1392

= 1000 ×1392 + 9 × 1392

= 1392000 + 12528

= 1404528

(e) 98 × 553

Solution:

98 × 553 = (100 – 2) × 553

= 100 × 553 – 2 × 553

= 55300 – 1066

= 54234

(f) 999 × 399

Solution:

999 × 399 = (1000 – 1) × 399

= 1000 × 399 – 1 × 399

= 399000 – 399

= 298601

Question 4.

Find the value by using distributive property.

(a) 1562 × 62 + 1562 × 38

Solution:

1562 × 62 + 1562 × 38

= 1562 × (62 + 38)

= 1562 × 100

= 156200

(b) 638 × 176 – 638 × 75 – 638

Solution:

638 × 176 – 638 × 75 – 638

= 638 (176 – 75 – 1)

= 638 (176 – 76)

= 638 × 100

= 63800

(c) 85 × 15 + 15 × 15

Solution:

85 × 15 + 15 × 15

= 15 × (85 + 15)

= 15 × 100

= 1500

(d) 688 × 10 × 437 – 6880 × 337

Solution:

688 × 10 × 437 – 6880 x 337

= 6880 × 437 – 6880 × 337

= 6880 × (437 – 337)

= 6880 × 100

= 688000

(e) 125 × 8 × 883 + 117 × 25 × 40

Solution:

125 × 8 × 883 + 117 × 25 × 40

= (125 × 8) × 883 + 117 × (25 × 40)

= 1000 × 883 + 117 × 1000

= 1000 × (883 + 117)

= 1000 × 1000

= 1,00,00,00

(f) 750 × 17 + 750 × 38 + 27 × 750 + 18 × 750

Solution:

750 × 17 + 750 × 38 + 27 × 750 + 18 × 750

= 750 (17 + 38 + 27 + 18)

= 750 × 100

= 75000

Question 5.

Rohan buys 12 computers and 12 printers. If the cost of one computer and one printer is ₹ 56233 and ₹ 7867 respectively, find the total cost incurred by Rohan (Use distributive property of multiplication).

Solution:

Cost of 12 computers = ₹ (12 × 56233)

Cost of 12 printers = ₹ (12 × 7867)

∴ Total cost of 12 computers and 12 printers

= 12 × 56233 + 12 × 7867

= 12 × (56233 + 7867)

= 12 × 64100

= ₹ 769200

Question 6.

In a school, the monthly fee of a child is ₹ 497. If there are 2983 students in the school, find the total fee collected in a month. (Use distributive property of multiplication)

Solution:

Fee of one child = ₹ 497

Number of students = 2983

∴ Total collection of fee = ₹ (2983 × 497)

= 2983 × (500 – 3)

= 2983 × 500 – 2983 × 3

= 1491500 – 8949

= 1482551

Hence, total fee collected = ₹ 1482551